VA HJR29 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Overpopulation of game animals; study; report. Requests the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries to study whether there is an overpopulation of wild animals in the Commonwealth. If the Department finds that overpopulation exists in a specific region or among particular species, the Department is requested to develop strategies for controlling the overpopulation.
Title
Wild game; Department of Game and Inland Fisheries to study overpopulation in Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102046D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HJ29 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HJ29+hil |