VA HJR267 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Introduced bill reprinted 14103300D
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Introduced bill reprinted 14103300D
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Mattie Sites.
Title
Commending Mattie Sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14103300D |
2014-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ267ER) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received |
2014-02-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-02-04 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14103300D |