VA HJR261 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ261ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ261ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Emily Boda.
Title
Commending Emily Boda.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ261ER) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Received | |
2012-01-27 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-25 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12104185D | |
2012-01-24 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12104185D |