VA HJR244 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ244ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ244ER)
Summary
Commending Elk Knob Elementary School.
Title
Commending Elk Knob Elementary School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ244ER) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Received | |
2008-01-25 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-25 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-18 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 088734588 | |
2008-01-17 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 088734588 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ244 |