VA HJR210 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ210ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ210ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Election of a Supreme Court of Virginia Justice.
Title
Judge; election in Supreme Court of Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (20-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended rejected (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended rejected (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ210ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (20-Y 18-N 1-A) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reading waived |
2016-01-26 | Senate | 2/3 of members present and voting needed to suspend Rules |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Rules suspended rejected (21-Y 18-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Received |
2016-01-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-01-26 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2016-01-26 | House | Presented 16104767D |