VA HJR21 | 2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR21
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth; guaranteed first-year admission; report. Requests the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to study the feasibility of implementing a guaranteed first-year admission policy at each public institution of higher education for certain high school graduates in the Commonwealth and report its findings and recommendations no later than the first day of the 2025 Regular Session of the General Assembly. Study; State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth; guaranteed first-year admission; report. Requests the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to study the feasibility of implementing a guaranteed first-year admission policy at each public institution of higher education for certain high school graduates in the Commonwealth and report its findings and recommendations no later than the first day of the 2025 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; SCHEV to study guaranteed first-year admission policy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104258D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR21 (Carry Over) 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Subjects
High Schools
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?251+sum+HJ21 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?251+ful+HJ21+hil |