VA HJR209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ209ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ209ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Henrico Citizen.
Title
Commending the Henrico Citizen.
Sponsors
Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ209ER) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-14 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-10 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22100921D |