VA HJR183 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
United States Constitution; constitutional convention. Urges the Congress of the United States to call a constitutional convention for the purposes of amending the Constitution of the United States to require (i) a balanced federal budget, (ii) line item veto authority to the President, and (iii) prohibition of unfunded mandates to the various states.
Title
Constitutional convention; urges U.S. Congress to call for purposes of amending U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-26 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10101734D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HJ183 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HJ183+hil |