VA HJR173 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; merging Eastern Virginia Medical School with Old Dominion University; report. Requests the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to study merging Eastern Virginia Medical School with Old Dominion University. In conducting its study, the Council shall examine the impact of having a state-supported medical school in the Hampton Roads region; consider the fiscal implications merging Eastern Virginia Medical School into Old Dominion University; and accept input from interested stakeholders, including the boards of visitors of both institutions.
Title
Eastern Virginia Medical School; SCHEV to study merging with Old Dominion University.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Rules |
2012-02-07 | House | Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote |
2012-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-20 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2012-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2012-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 12103605D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ173 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ173+hil |