VA HJR132 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC to study homeland security planning and preparedness; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the ongoing planning and preparedness efforts throughout the Commonwealth with regard to homeland security and emergency management. The Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission must report its final findings and recommendations to the 2013 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Homeland security and emergency management; JLARC to study planning & preparedness efforts in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-02-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ132H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105190D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Taken up | |
2012-02-07 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105190D-H1 | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101853D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Military and Emergency Laws
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Military and Emergency Laws
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports