VA HJR116 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
National Beer Day. Designates April 7, in 2019 and in each succeeding year, as National Beer Day in Virginia. This resolution was incorporated into HJ 90.
Title
National Beer Day; designating as April 7, 2019, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HJ90-Robinson) by voice vote |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103825D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HJ116 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HJ116+hil |