VA HJR113 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; joint subcommittee to study Virginia's withdrawal from ICPRB; report. Establishes a joint subcommittee to study Virginia's withdrawal from the Interstate Commission on the Potomac River Basin and its effects upon the viability of the Potomac as a source of drinking water, recreation, and other benefits.
Title
ICPRB; joint subcommittee to study State's withdrawal & effects upon source of drinking water, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Rules | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103538D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HJ113 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HJ113+hil |