VA HJR110 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ110ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ110ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Gloria Randolph-King.
Title
Celebrating the life of Gloria Randolph-King.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Chad Green [R] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Amy Laufer [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] |
Del. Joseph McNamara [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ110ER) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-05 | House | Agreed to by House |
2024-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-01-31 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24104379D |