VA HJR1044 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1044ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1044ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Falls Church City Public Schools.
Title
Commending Falls Church City Public Schools.
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1044ER) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-20 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17105259D |