VA HJR10 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ10ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Donald Williams, Sr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Donald Williams, Sr.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ10ER)
2018-01-18SenateAgreed to by Senate
2018-01-15SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2018-01-15SenateReceived
2018-01-12HouseAgreed to by House
2018-01-12HouseEngrossed by House
2017-12-15HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/10/18 18100574D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback