VA HB998 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local law-enforcement agencies; body-worn cameras. Requires localities to adopt and establish a written policy for the operation of a body-worn camera system that conforms to the model policy established by the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) prior to purchasing or deploying a body-worn camera system. The bill requires such policy to provide that (i) recorded individuals have a right to view and make copies of any audiovisual recording in which they are depicted; (ii) recordings be destroyed within 60 days unless certain exceptions apply; and (iii) the locality deploying the system review the recordings on a periodic basis to determine whether persons wearing the body-worn cameras are acting inappropriately or exhibiting bias. The bill provides that the Commonwealth shall reimburse each locality up to one-half of the costs of any body-worn camera system, provided that the locality has adopted and established a written policy that has been approved by the Department. The bill requires the Department to establish a model policy for the operation of body-worn camera systems and establish procedures for the reimbursement of counties and cities that purchase a body-worn camera system.
Title
Law-enforcement agencies, local; body-worn cameras.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102838D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB998 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB998+hil |