VA HB995 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tracking wounded bear, deer, or turkey. Allows a licensed hunter to use tracking dogs to find a wounded or dead bear, deer, or turkey. The bill authorizes the hunter to have a weapon in his possession and to use it to humanely kill the tracked animal, including after legal shooting hours. The bill prohibits using the weapon to hunt, wound, or kill any animal other than the animal the hunter is tracking, except in self-defense. Current law prohibits a hunter from having a weapon in his possession while tracking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs; licensed hunter may track a wounded bear, turkey, or deer with certain weapon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
2018-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 447 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB995ER)
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06SenateRead third time
2018-03-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB995H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106509D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106509D-H1
2018-02-07HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102690D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291305.3(n/a)See Bill Text
291516.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB995
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB995+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB995H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB995ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0447+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0102V0028+HB0995
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0051+HB0995
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0627+HB0995
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0100+HB0995
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0925HB0995+HB0995
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0973HB0995+HB0995

Bill Comments

feedback