VA HB99 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Continuing education; funeral service licensees, funeral directors, and embalmers. Provides that approved continuing education courses for funeral service licensees, funeral directors, and embalmers shall include either one hour of compliance with laws and regulations governing the profession or one hour of preneed funeral arrangements per year, provided that at least one hour of continuing education regarding preneed funeral arrangements is completed every three years. Current law requires at least one hour of compliance with laws and regulations governing the profession and at least one hour of preneed funeral arrangements per year. The bill contains technical amendments. Continuing education; funeral service licensees, funeral directors, and embalmers. Provides that approved continuing education courses for funeral service licensees, funeral directors, and embalmers shall include either one hour of compliance with laws and regulations governing the profession or one hour of preneed funeral arrangements per year, provided that at least one hour of continuing education regarding preneed funeral arrangements is completed every three years. Current law requires at least one hour of compliance with laws and regulations governing the profession and at least one hour of preneed funeral arrangements per year. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Funeral service licensees, funeral directors, etc.; continuing education completion every 3 years.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB99ER) |
2022-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Printed as engrossed 22100665D-E |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB99E |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100665D |