VA HB989 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0974)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0974)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designation of beneficiary on motor vehicle title; multiple owners. Provides a process whereby a motor vehicle, trailer, or semitrailer with multiple owners can be titled with a designated beneficiary. The bill requires the consent of all owners and provides that the transfer of ownership would occur upon the death of the last surviving owner.
Title
Motor vehicle title; designation of beneficiary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0974) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 974 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB989ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101436D |