VA HB988 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Compensating victims of crime; persons eligible for award; grandchildren. Includes grandchildren of the victim of a crime, who are alive at the time of the commission of the crime, in the list of persons eligible for compensation as a result of the death of the victim (i) as a direct result of the crime or (ii) due to the victim's trying to prevent a crime or attempted crime from occurring or trying to apprehend a person who had committed a crime in his presence or had committed a felony.
Title
Compensating victims of crime; persons eligible for award includes grandchildren.
Sponsors
Del. Amanda Batten [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB988ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101592D |