VA HB98 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB98
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Continued to 2023 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Continued to 2023 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Adult protective services; central registry. Creates a central registry of substantiated complaints of adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation to be maintained by the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services. The bill establishes (i) investigation requirements for local departments of social services related to reports of adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation; (ii) record retention and disclosure requirements for the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services and local departments of social services; (iii) notice requirements related to findings by local departments and central registry entries; and (iv) an appeals process to contest the findings of a local department related to substantiated reports of adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation.
Title
Adult protective services; central registry.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Continued to 2023 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100661D |
Same As/Similar To
HB98 (Carry Over) 2022-02-08 - Continued to 2023 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 148 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 148.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 148.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1605.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1605.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |