VA HB979 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; provisional teacher licensure; teachers licensed or certified outside of the United States. Permits the Board of Education to provide for the issuance of a provisional license, valid for a period not to exceed three years, to any individual who has held within the last five years a valid and officially issued and recognized license or certification to teach issued by an entity outside of the United States but does not meet the requirements for a renewable license if the individual's license or certification to teach has been evaluated and verified by an entity approved by the Department of Education.
Title
Provisional teacher licensure; teachers licensed or certified outside of the United States.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB979ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107760D-H1 |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-07 | House | Delegates: Tran, Davis, Wampler |
2022-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Hashmi, Newman |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22106671D-S1 (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB979S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106671D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106671D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103549D-E |
2022-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB979E |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103549D |
Same As/Similar To
SB68 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)
SB68 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)
SB68 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)