VA HB97 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Newborn screening for Krabbe disease. Directs the Department of Health to review Krabbe disease and provide recommendations to the Board of Health regarding whether Krabbe disease should be included in newborn screening.
Title
Newborn screening; screening for Krabbe disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB97ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB97H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107197D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107197D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100420D |