VA HB962 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Tabled in Appropriations by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Tabled in Appropriations by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Penalty for DUI maiming. Provides that the punishment for DUI maiming, a Class 6 felony, shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of one year.
Title
DUI; penalty for maiming shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of one year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House: Tabled in Appropriations by voice vote | |
2012-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-06 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | House: Incorporates HB50 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104941D-H1 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102296D |