VA HB955 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limited liability companies; entity conversions. Restructures the Virginia Limited Liability Company Act (Act) to locate into a new article all existing provisions related to the formation of a limited liability company (LLC) by entity conversion. In addition, the measure brings the current business entity conversion provisions in the Virginia Business Trust Act into alignment with the entity conversion provisions of the Act as restructured in this measure. The measure also provides for the reorganization of an LLC in bankruptcy, as is provided for Virginia stock and nonstock corporations. The measure makes technical adjustments to the Act to bring it in conformance with similar provisions applicable to other business entities.
Title
Limited liability companies; entity conversions.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB955ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103571D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1003.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1010.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1010.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1018.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1038.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1050.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1052 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1054 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1055 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1056 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1060 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1066 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1069.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1070 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1071 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1072 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1073.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1076 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1077 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1078 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1080 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1081 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1087 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1264 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1272 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1277 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 722.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 722.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 944.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 944.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 944.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 944.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 944.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |