VA HB95 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Jurisdiction of Court of Appeals; contempt of court. Provides that the Court of Appeals of Virginia has appellate jurisdiction over a judgment of the circuit court that holds or fails to hold a person in contempt of court. Under current law, the Court of Appeals has jurisdiction only over a judgment that holds a person in contempt of court.
Title
Court of Appeals; jurisdiction, contempt of court.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101980D |