VA HB94 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public Guardianship and Conservator Ombudsman Office. Directs the Commissioner of the Department for Aging and Rehabilitation Services to establish a Public Guardianship and Conservator Ombudsman Office within the Department to (i) assist members of the public in understanding the public guardianship process and make available to the public information regarding public guardianship, including the rights and responsibilities of public guardians and individuals subject to public guardianship; (ii) provide information to the public regarding local and regional public guardian and conservator programs in the Commonwealth; (iii) receive complaints regarding public guardians, provide referrals to public and private agencies and other entities for assistance in resolving the issue giving rise to the complaint, and provide information regarding how to navigate the complaint process; and (iv) collect data regarding the number of inquiries and complaints received, the types of assistance provided, and the disposition of the matter, if known. The bill directs the Department to make information regarding the Office available on its website and to disseminate information regarding the Office to all adults for whom a public guardian is appointed and all adults residing in various congregate care settings. Public Guardianship and Conservator Ombudsman Office. Directs the Commissioner of the Department for Aging and Rehabilitation Services to establish a Public Guardianship and Conservator Ombudsman Office within the Department to (i) assist members of the public in understanding the public guardianship process and make available to the public information regarding public guardianship, including the rights and responsibilities of public guardians and individuals subject to public guardianship; (ii) provide information to the public regarding local and regional public guardian and conservator programs in the Commonwealth; (iii) receive complaints regarding public guardians, provide referrals to public and private agencies and other entities for assistance in resolving the issue giving rise to the complaint, and provide information regarding how to navigate the complaint process; and (iv) collect data regarding the number of inquiries and complaints received, the types of assistance provided, and the disposition of the matter, if known. The bill directs the Department to make information regarding the Office available on its website and to disseminate information regarding the Office to all adults for whom a public guardian is appointed and all adults residing in various congregate care settings.
Title
Public Guardianship and Conservator Ombudsman Office; established.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100562D |