VA HB94 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Legal custodian; parties to a pending custody Legal custodian; parties to a pending custody or visitation case; notice of adoption proceeding. Provides that a legal custodian of a child being placed for adoption, and any other named parties in pending cases in which the custody or visitation of such child is at issue, shall be entitled to proper notice of any adoption proceeding and an opportunity to be heard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption; proper notice of proceeding to legal custodian.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-02-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 24, 2020
2020-02-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 17, 2020
2020-02-13SenateSigned by President
2020-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB94ER)
2020-02-13HouseEnrolled
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead third time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-31HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HousePrinted as engrossed 20102572D-E
2020-01-30HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB94E
2020-01-30HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-30HouseRead second time
2020-01-29HouseRead first time
2020-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-21HouseReferred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-01-14HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2019-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-12-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102572D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321202(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB94
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB94+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB94E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB94ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0802V0029+HB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0065+HB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0266+HB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0099+HB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0448HB0094+HB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0463HB0094+HB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0596HB0094+HB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0597HB0094+HB0094

Bill Comments

feedback