VA HB938 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Persons liable to serve as jurors. Provides that, for purposes of determining whether a person is liable to serve as a juror, military personnel of the United States Marine Corps and Coast Guard are not considered residents of the Commonwealth merely by reason of being stationed in the Commonwealth. Members of the United States Army, Air Force, and Navy are likewise not considered Commonwealth residents under current law.
Title
Jurors; persons liable to serve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100182D |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Jury Service and Jurors
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Jury Service and Jurors
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB938 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB938+hil |