VA HB937 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Student transportation; innovative alternatives to school buses. States that the intent of the General Assembly is that school boards encourage the implementation of innovative low-cost or no-cost alternatives to transporting students to and from school on school buses, including organizing or otherwise facilitating, encouraging, or supporting biking or walking school buses whereby groups of students ride bicycles or walk to and from school. Student transportation; innovative alternatives to school buses. States that the intent of the General Assembly is that school boards encourage the implementation of innovative low-cost or no-cost alternatives to transporting students to and from school on school buses, including organizing or otherwise facilitating, encouraging, or supporting biking or walking school buses whereby groups of students ride bicycles or walk to and from school.
Title
Innovative alternative school transportation; school boards to implement low/no-cost alternatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 535 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB937ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB937H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106451D-H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106451D-H1 |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102973D |