VA HB933 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
High school graduation and dropout data; students who have been placed in the custody of the Department of Social Services. Provides that for the purpose of collecting, analyzing, and reporting high school graduation and dropout data on students who have been placed in the custody of the Department of Social Services and who have enrolled in another school division as a result of such placement, the Board shall consider any such student to be enrolled in the previous school division of residence until he has been enrolled in the current school division of residence for one complete semester or 18 weeks.
Title
High school graduation and dropout data; students who have been placed in custody of DSS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Education |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101449D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB933 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB933+hil |