VA HB925 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0925)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0925)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DMAS; steps to facilitate transition between two programs. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services (DMAS) to establish a process for (i) conducting a comprehensive needs assessment of a person who chooses to participate in the Medicaid Works program to determine the services such person may need to live and fully participate in his community and (ii) developing a plan of support for such person to guide the person in selection of the best waiver program for his needs. The bill also requires DMAS to develop processes to (a) enable a person who transitions from a Home and Community-Based Services waiver service to the Medicaid Works waiver program to retain his Home and Community-Based Services waiver slot for up to 180 days following the date of such transition and (b) give priority to individuals previously receiving services through the Home and Community-Based Services waiver program who transitioned to the Medicaid Works program and who subsequently seek to resume services through the Home and Community-Based Services waiver program.
Title
DMAS; steps to facilitate transition between two programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0925) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 925 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB925ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB925H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106699D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106699D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105051D |