VA HB925 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Castle doctrine; self-defense and defense of others. Codifies a version of the "castle doctrine," allowing the use of physical force, including deadly force, by a person in his dwelling against an intruder in the dwelling who has committed an overt act against him or another person in the dwelling, without civil liability.
Title
Castle doctrine; codifies version allowing use of deadly force against an intruder in dwelling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100106D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB925 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB925+hil |