VA HB915 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - House: Stricken from docket by Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - House: Stricken from docket by Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Towing and Recovery Operators; regulation exemptions. Requires that the Board of Towing and Recovery Operators exempt from its regulations "automobile or watercraft transporters," "stinger-steered automobiles or watercraft transporters," or "tractor trucks" as defined in §46.2-100 of the Code of Virginia when such transporters are capable of transporting four or more vehicles and have appropriate and required interstate operating authority, but only when such transporters are not responding to motor vehicle crashes and breakdowns.
Title
Towing and Recovery Operators, Board of; regulation exemptions.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | House: Stricken from docket by Transportation by voice vote | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102702D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB915 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB915+hil |