VA HB915 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
Summary
Credit Counseling Act; fees. Removes two of the existing factors that the State Corporation Commission is required to use when setting the annual fee assessed on licensed credit counseling agencies. The factors being removed are the total assets held in trust by a licensee for Virginia consumers and the total revenues of a licensee from Virginia consumers.
Title
Credit Counseling Act; removes two factors that SCC is required to use when setting fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 508 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-05 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB915ER) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-28 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-22 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080104864 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB915 |