VA HB913 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1041)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Institutions of higher education; sexual violence policies; immunity from disciplinary action; certain students who make reports. Requires the governing board of each nonprofit private institution of higher education and each public institution of higher education except the Virginia Military Institute to include as part of its policy, code, rules, or set of standards governing sexual violence a provision for immunity from disciplinary action based on personal consumption of drugs or alcohol where such disclosure is made in conjunction with a good faith report of an act of sexual violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions; sexual violence policies, immunity from disciplinary action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1041)
2020-04-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1041 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB913ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Agree To (92-Y 2-N)
2020-03-04HouseConference report agreed to by House (92-Y 2-N)
2020-03-04HouseConference substitute printed 20109551D-H2
2020-03-04 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-03SenateSenators: Petersen, Locke, Lewis
2020-03-03SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-02HouseDelegates: Helmer, Hudson, Collins
2020-03-02HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-02HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-28SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-28SenateSenate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2020-02-26HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20108768D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB913S1
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108768D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108768D-S1
2020-02-20SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-31HouseVOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
2020-01-30HousePrinted as engrossed 20106598D-EH1
2020-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB913EH1
2020-01-30HouseAmendment by Delegate Helmer agreed to
2020-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106598D-H1
2020-01-30HouseRead second time
2020-01-29HouseRead first time
2020-01-27HouseReported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2020-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106598D-H1
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103133D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231808(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB913&201+sum+HB913
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB913+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB913H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB913EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB913S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB913H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB913ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1041+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0902V0010+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0045+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0251+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0312+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB0913+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0863HB0913+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1439+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1216HB0913+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1773+HB0913
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1749HB0913+HB0913

Bill Comments

feedback