VA HB913 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health care costs for inmates. Requires the Director of the Department of Corrections to develop procedures for identifying inmates who may be eligible for medical assistance, enrolling such inmates in the state medical assistance program, and ensuring that claims for eligible services are submitted to the Department of Medical Assistance Services rather than the Department of Corrections, and directs the Attorney General to include providers of inpatient medical services to inmates who are eligible for medical assistance services in audits and investigations of providers of services furnished under the state plan for medical assistance. The bill also requires the Director of the Department of Corrections to develop procedures for reviewing claims for reimbursement for medical services submitted to the Department for accuracy and for identifying fraudulent or inaccurate claims and recovering amounts paid pursuant thereto.
Title
Inmates; eligibility for health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-14 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101333D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB913 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB913+hil |