VA HB913 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Solid waste management plan; optional. Removes the mandate that a governing body develop and implement a regional or local solid waste management plan, making such plans optional. The bill includes technical amendments.
Title
Solid waste management plan, regional or local; making such plans optional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB913H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105098D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105098D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102889D |