VA HB911 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local credits for approved local volunteer activities. Enables localities, by ordinance, to provide a credit against taxes and fees imposed by the locality to an individual who provides approved volunteer services in the locality. As defined in the bill, "approved volunteer services" includes (i) volunteer first responders or (ii) individuals who perform volunteer services to a nonprofit organization or to the locality, if such services are approved by the locality. The bill specifies that the credit shall not be applied against any property taxes or payments in lieu of property taxes. The bill gives localities discretion to determine which taxes or fees are permissible uses of the credit and which services qualify for the credit.
Title
Approved local volunteer activities; enables localities to provide credit against taxes & fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 773 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB911ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's substitute printed 22107976D-H1 |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB911ER) |
2022-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100927D |