VA HB91 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Telephone systems within correctional facilities; commission payments. Prohibits entities or agencies of the Commonwealth or political subdivisions thereof from receiving commission payments from companies that provide inmate telephone services.
Title
Telephone systems within correctional facilities; commission payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2015-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-12-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101247D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB91 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB91+hil |