VA HB908 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Contract passenger carriers. Eliminates the requirements that (i) contract passenger carrier service be provided for a minimum of one hour per vehicle trip and (ii) each vehicle carry a trip sheet showing passenger destinations.
Title
Contract passenger carriers; eliminates certain requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - House - House: Continued to 2015 in Transportation (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Transportation |
2014-01-23 | House | Continued to 2015 in Transportation (18-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102096D |
Same As/Similar To
SB531 (Same As) 2014-12-04 - Left in Transportation