VA HB903 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Lottery Board; regulation of the manufacturing, distributing, operating, hosting, and playing of dominant skill video games; penalties. Authorizes the manufacture, distribution, operation, hosting, and playing of dominant skill video games in the Commonwealth, to be regulated by the Virginia Lottery Board. The bill specifies the licensing requirements for the manufacture, distribution, operation, and hosting of dominant skill video games and imposes criminal and civil penalties for violations of the law and regulations related to dominant skill video games. The bill imposes a 10 percent tax on all gross profits generated from the play of dominant skill video games and the sale of fills by distributor licensees to operator licensees and provides for how the tax proceeds are disbursed. The bill also establishes the Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Fund, administered by the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to provide counseling and other support services for compulsive and problem gamblers, develop problem gambling treatment and prevention programs, and provide grants to support organizations that provide assistance to compulsive gamblers.
Title
Virginia Lottery Board; regulation of the manufacturing, distributing, operating video games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in General Laws |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1589-Bagby) by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105003D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 334.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4027 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4056 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB903 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB903+hil |