VA HB900 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure and practice of associate physicians. Authorizes the Board of Medicine to issue a two-year license to practice as an associate physician to an applicant who is 18 years of age or older, is of good moral character, has successfully graduated from an accredited medical school, has successfully completed Step 1 and Step 2 of the United States Medical Licensing Examination, and has not been engaged in a postgraduate medical internship or residency training program. The bill requires all associate physicians to practice in accordance with a practice agreement entered into between the associate physician and a physician licensed by the Board and provides for prescriptive authority of associate physicians in accordance with regulations of the Board. The bill requires the Board to promulgate such regulations to be effective no later than July 1, 2018.
Title
Associate physicians; requirements for licensure, practice agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 16100536D-E |
2016-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB900E |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100536D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2941.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2941.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2941.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |