VA HB90 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher grievance procedures; hearing; three-member fact-finding panel. Permits a school board to conduct a teacher grievance hearing before a three-member fact-finding panel consisting of one member selected by the teacher, one member selected by the division superintendent, and an impartial hearing officer, selected by the other two panel members, to serve as the chairman of the panel. Under current law, the school board has the option of appointing a hearing officer or conducting such hearing itself. The bill also removes the requirement that a teacher grievance hearing be set within 15 days of the request for such hearing and extends from five days to 10 days the minimum period of advanced written notice to the teacher of the time and place of such hearing.
Title
Teacher grievance procedures; hearing, three-member fact-finding panel.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-12-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101181D |