VA HB90 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Possession of handguns by members of the Virginia National Guard. Allows a member of the Virginia National Guard to possess a concealed handgun owned by him at National Guard facilities and facilities under contract with the National Guard if such member has a valid concealed handgun permit. The bill also provides that the member's commanding officer may prohibit the member from possessing a concealed handgun while participating in any training or other exercises where the commanding officer reasonably determines that (i) such possession would interfere with the conduct of such training or other exercises, (ii) such possession may result in mission impairment, or (ii) the member is unfit to carry a handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia National Guard; possession of handguns by members at certain facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
2016-04-20HouseEnacted, Chapter 740 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-04-20SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled bill text (HB90ER2)
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled
2016-04-20 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2016-04-20SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-04-01HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2016-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
2016-03-06SenateSigned by President
2016-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-03HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB90ER)
2016-03-03HouseEnrolled
2016-03-02HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2016-03-02HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2016-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-29SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2016-02-29SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2016-02-29SenateReading of amendment waived
2016-02-29SenateRead third time
2016-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-24SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2016-02-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2016-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-04HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-03HousePrinted as engrossed 16104825D-EH1
2016-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB90EH1
2016-02-03HouseAmendment by Delegate Taylor agreed to
2016-02-03HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2016-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB90H1
2016-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 16104825D-H1
2016-02-02HouseRead second time
2016-02-01HouseRead first time
2016-01-29HouseIncorporates HB119
2016-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 16104825D-H1
2016-01-29HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2016-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
2016-01-19HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #1
2015-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2015-12-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100115D

Same As/Similar To

HB119 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB90
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB90+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB90H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB90EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB90ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB90ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0740+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H1501V0009+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H15V0015+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0271+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S03V0306+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0676HB0090+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0693HB0090+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0716HB0090+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0717HB0090+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1100+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1409+HB0090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1162HB0090+HB0090

Bill Comments

feedback