VA HB90 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House: Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House: Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Correctional enterprises; exemption from mandatory purchase provisions. Provides that any department, institution, or agency of the Commonwealth may use competitive sealed bidding in accordance with the Virginia Public Procurement Act (§2.2-4300 et seq.) for the procurement of furniture without first seeking an exemption from the provisions of §53.1-47 from the Director of the Division of Purchases and Supply.
Title
Correctional enterprises; exemption from mandatory purchase provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House: Incorporated by General Laws | |
2012-02-09 | House: Incorporated by General Laws | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB263-Peace) by voice vote | |
2012-02-07 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2012-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-31 | House: Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote | |
2012-01-19 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2011-12-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-12-27 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100757D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB90 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB90+hil |