VA HB9 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reporting lost or stolen firearms; civil penalty. Requires that, if a firearm is lost or stolen from a person who lawfully possessed it, such person shall report the loss or theft of the firearm to any local law-enforcement agency or the Department of State Police within 48 hours after such person discovers the loss or theft or is informed by a person with personal knowledge of the loss or theft. The bill requires the relevant law-enforcement agency to enter the report information into the National Crime Information Center. A violation is punishable by a civil penalty of not more than $250. The bill provides that a person who, in good faith, reports the loss or theft is immune from criminal or civil liability for acts or omissions that result from the loss or theft. The immunity does not apply to a person who knowingly gives a false report. The bill does not apply to the loss or theft of an antique firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; reporting those lost or stolen, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 743 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB9ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Adoption (55-Y 44-N)
2020-02-28HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (55-Y 44-N)
2020-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-26SenateChair votes Yes
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate with amendment (20-Y 20-N)
2020-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-26SenateAmendment by Senator McClellan agreed to
2020-02-26SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateReported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N)
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-30HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2020-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2020-01-29HouseEngrossed by House
2020-01-29HousePassed by temporarily
2020-01-29HouseRead second time
2020-01-28HouseRead first time
2020-01-24HouseReported from Public Safety (15-Y 7-N)
2019-11-18HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2019-11-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100298D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182287.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback