VA HB898 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB76-Bell, Richard P.) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB76-Bell, Richard P.) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expenditures and reports on instructional spending. Requires each local school board to allocate 65 percent of its operating budget to instructional spending. Local school boards must report annually to the Board of Education the percentage of their operating budgets allocated to instructional spending. Any school division that fails to meet the 65 percent requirement must present a plan to the Board of Education to increase instructional spending by one percent in the following fiscal year and each subsequent year until the 65 percent requirement is met. School divisions failing to submit such a plan must be audited by the Auditor of Public Accounts, who is required to submit recommendations to the Board, including instruction concerning how failing school divisions can increase their instructional spending to 65 percent. In addition, the Board must annually report to the Senate Committee on Finance and the House Committee on Appropriations the amount of spending allocated by the local school divisions to instructional spending based on the reports submitted annually by the local school boards.
Title
Instructional spending; local school board to report expenditures annually.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | House: Incorporated by Education (HB76-Bell, Richard P.) by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB76-Bell, Richard P.) by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Education sub: #3 Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103665D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB898 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB898+hil |