VA HB896 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Motor vehicle dealer; definition. Clarifies that in order to be classified as a motor vehicle dealer a person must (i) buy, offer to sell or sell, display or permit the display for sale of, exchange, or negotiate on behalf of others the sale, purchase, or exchange of at least five motor vehicles within 12 consecutive months or (ii) be wholly or partially engaged in the business of selling motor vehicles, whether or not the vehicles are owned by such person, provided that such person, through such business, offers to sell, sells, displays, or permits the display for sale of at least five motor vehicles within 12 consecutive months. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle dealer; clarifies definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HouseLeft in Transportation
2018-02-06HouseContinued to 2019 in Transportation by voice vote
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104021D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621500(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback