VA HB895 | 2016 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]


Board of Education; high school graduation requirements. Removes existing provisions related to standard and advanced studies diplomas and standard and verified units of credit and requires the Board of Education, in establishing high school graduation requirements, to (i) develop and implement, in consultation with stakeholders representing elementary and secondary education, higher education, and business and industry in the Commonwealth and including parents, policymakers, and community leaders in the Commonwealth, a Profile of a Virginia Graduate that identifies the knowledge and skills that students should attain during high school in order to be successful contributors to the economy of the Commonwealth, giving due consideration to critical thinking, creative thinking, collaboration, communication, and citizenship; (ii) emphasize the development of core skill sets in the early years of high school; and (iii) establish multiple paths toward college and career readiness for students to follow in the later years of high school that include internships, externships, and credentialing. The bill also sets forth the procedure for the establishment of such graduation requirements. The bill specifies that such graduation requirements shall apply to each student who enrolls in high school as (a) a freshman after July 1, 2018; (b) a sophomore after July 1, 2019; (c) a junior after July 1, 2020; or (d) a senior after July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


High school graduation; graduation requirements.


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 3-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 88 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 50-N) (Y: 46 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2016-04-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750)
2016-04-20HouseEnacted, Chapter 750 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-04-20SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled bill text (HB895ER2)
2016-04-20 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2016-04-20SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N)
2016-04-20HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 7-N)
2016-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-04-04HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2016-03-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16
2016-03-28SenateSigned by President
2016-03-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB895ER)
2016-03-11SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2016-03-11SenatePassed by temporarily
2016-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 3-N)
2016-03-10HouseConference report agreed to by House (90-Y 3-N)
2016-03-10HouseConference substitute printed 16106293D-H1
2016-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2016-03-09SenateSenators: Carrico, Dunnavant, Miller
2016-03-09SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2016-03-09HouseDelegates: Greason, LeMunyon, Bulova
2016-03-09HouseConferees appointed by House
2016-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2016-03-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2016-03-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2016-03-04SenatePassed by for the day
2016-03-02HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N)
2016-03-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 16105836D-S1 (2-Y 97-N)
2016-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-29SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB895S1
2016-02-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 16105836D-S1
2016-02-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2016-02-29SenateRead third time
2016-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 16105836D-S1
2016-02-25SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2016-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-16HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
2016-02-16HouseRead third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N)
2016-02-15HousePrinted as engrossed 16100720D-E
2016-02-15HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB895E
2016-02-15HouseVOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 50-N)
2016-02-15HouseAmendment by Delegate LeMunyon paragraph #4 rejected (45-Y 50-N)
2016-02-15HouseAmendment by Delegate LeMunyon paragraph #3 agreed to
2016-02-15HouseRead second time
2016-02-12HousePassed by for the day
2016-02-11HouseRead first time
2016-02-10HouseReported from Education (19-Y 3-N)
2016-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2016-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Innovation
2016-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2016-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100720D

Same As/Similar To

SB336 (Same As) 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221129.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221199.4(n/a)See Bill Text
221209.1:3(n/a)See Bill Text
221227.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221253.13:3(n/a)See Bill Text
221253.13:4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call

Bill Comments